NY S04442 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the division of criminal justice services to publish quarterly reports beginning October 1, 2020, providing information related to firearms, rifles and shotguns used in the commission of crimes in the state of New York.
Title
Requires the division of criminal justice services to publish quarterly reports beginning October 1, 2020, providing information related to firearms, rifles and shotguns used in the commission of crimes in the state of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.548 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4442B |
2020-02-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1249 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4442A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2019-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |