NY S04440 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits beneficiaries of correction officers employed by Nassau county to elect to receive, in a lump sum, an amount payable equal to the pension reserve that would have been established had the member retired on the date of his or her death, or the value of the death benefit and the reserve-for-increased-take-home-pay, whichever is greater.
Title
Permits beneficiaries of correction officers employed by Nassau county to elect to receive, in a lump sum, an amount payable equal to the pension reserve that would have been established had the member retired on the date of his or her death, or the value of the death benefit and the reserve-for-increased-take-home-pay, whichever is greater.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-29 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.534 |
2021-10-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | home rule request |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.672 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a6936 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-02 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2021-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1379 |
2021-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06936 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - substituted by s4440