NY S04436 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes lakes in adopt-a-municipal park, shoreline or roadway programs.
Title
Includes lakes in adopt-a-municipal park, shoreline or roadway programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-06-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1850 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05976 (Same As) 2022-05-09 - reported referred to rules