NY S04435 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - SIGNED CHAP.468
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - SIGNED CHAP.468
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires members of a board of trustees of public, free association and Indian libraries to complete two hours of trustee education annually.
Title
Requires members of a board of trustees of public, free association and Indian libraries to complete two hours of trustee education annually.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Libraries Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate Libraries Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.468 |
2021-09-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.573 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a6121b |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-01 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4435B |
2021-05-24 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4435A |
2021-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-04-28 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.804 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO LIBRARIES |
2021-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06121 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - substituted by s4435b