NY S04432 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3034
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3034
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that where the taxable status date is on or before April fourteenth, income tax year shall mean the twelve month period for which the owner or owners filed a federal personal income tax return for the year before the income tax year immediately preceding the date of application and where the taxable status date is on or after April fifteenth income tax year shall mean the twelve month period for which owner or owners filed a federal personal income tax return for the income tax year immediately preceding the date of application.
Title
Provides that where the taxable status date is on or before April fourteenth, income tax year shall mean the twelve month period for which the owner or owners filed a federal personal income tax return for the year before the income tax year immediately preceding the date of application and where the taxable status date is on or after April fifteenth income tax year shall mean the twelve month period for which owner or owners filed a federal personal income tax return for the income tax year immediately preceding the date of application.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3034 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1637 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A03034 (Same As) 2021-11-03 - signed chap.558