NY S04431 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.215
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.215
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the Liverpool central school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Title
Permits the Liverpool central school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.215 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.300 |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | substituted for a3234 |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | referred to education |
2021-04-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-04-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-03-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.559 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A03234 (Same As) 2021-05-10 - substituted by s4431