NY S04429 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - referred to economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the commissioner of economic development to publicize certain information related to programs for small business enterprises and minority and women-owned business enterprises.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the commissioner of economic development to publicize certain information related to programs for small business enterprises and minority and women-owned business enterprises.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblyreferred to economic development
2019-06-17SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-03SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-30Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-29Senate1ST REPORT CAL.954
2019-03-11SenateREFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS

Same As/Similar To

A04921 (Same As) 2019-02-05 - referred to economic development

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback