NY S04423 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits persons from holding civil office when convicted of certain felonies.
Title
Prohibits persons from holding civil office when convicted of certain felonies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.768 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |