NY S04413 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - APPROVAL MEMO.21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - APPROVAL MEMO.21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to notice of employee rights and remedies and the employee handbook; alters the date when such provisions take effect.
Title
Relates to notice of employee rights and remedies and the employee handbook; alters the date when such provisions take effect.
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.21 |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.556 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.265 |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | substituted for a6678 |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2019-03-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.258 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A06678 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - APPROVAL MEMO.21