NY S04406 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - PRINT NUMBER 4406D
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - PRINT NUMBER 4406D
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Legalizes the possession, acquisition, use, delivery, transfer, transport or administration of medical marihuana by a certified patient or designated caregiver for a certified medical use; prescribes procedures for such possession, acquisition, etc. including certification of patients by their practitioner, and that, in the practitioner's professional judgment, the serious condition should be treated with the medical use of marihuana; provides that possession or acquisition of marihuana shall be lawful under these provisions provided that the marihuana possessed does not exceed a total aggregate weight of two and a half ounces; directs the department of health to monitor such use and promulgate rules and regulations for registry identification cards; provides for reports by the department of health to the governor and legislature on the medical use of marihuana.
Title
Legalizes the possession, acquisition, use, delivery, transfer, transport or administration of medical marihuana by a certified patient or designated caregiver for a certified medical use; prescribes procedures for such possession, acquisition, etc. including certification of patients by their practitioner, and that, in the practitioner's professional judgment, the serious condition should be treated with the medical use of marihuana; provides that possession or acquisition of marihuana shall be lawful under these provisions provided that the marihuana possessed does not exceed a total aggregate weight of two and a half ounces; directs the department of health to monitor such use and promulgate rules and regulations for registry identification cards; provides for reports by the department of health to the governor and legislature on the medical use of marihuana.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4406D |
2014-06-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2014-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4406C |
2014-06-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2014-05-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-04-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4406B |
2014-04-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2014-04-07 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2013-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4406A |
2013-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2013-03-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A06357 (Same As) 2014-07-05 - signed chap.90