NY S04402 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - APPROVAL MEMO.9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - APPROVAL MEMO.9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Gender Recognition Act"; repeals certain provisions relating to driver's licenses.
Title
Enacts the "Gender Recognition Act"; repeals certain provisions relating to driver's licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.9 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.158 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.560 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a5465d |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-01 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4402B |
2021-05-19 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4402A |
2021-03-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-03-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.515 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A05465 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - substituted by s4402b