NY S04399 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the state office of the utility consumer advocate to represent interests of residential utility customers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the state office of the utility consumer advocate to represent interests of residential utility customers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 125 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.487
2019-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a1966
2019-06-17Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-17SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-17SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-29SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-22Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-21Senate1ST REPORT CAL.863
2019-04-30SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2019-03-11SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A01966 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - substituted by s4399

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback