NY S04395 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Housing, Construction, and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the determination of primary residency of rent regulated housing accommodations based upon the filing of income tax returns and place of voting.
Title
Provides for the determination of primary residency of rent regulated housing accommodations based upon the filing of income tax returns and place of voting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.779 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |