NY S04377 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to privacy protection policies on internet websites, online services, online applications and mobile applications that collect social security numbers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to privacy protection policies on internet websites, online services, online applications and mobile applications that collect social security numbers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-07SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2024-05-23SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-05-22Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-05-21Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1405
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY
2023-02-07SenateREFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback