NY S04369 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - PRINT NUMBER 4369A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - PRINT NUMBER 4369A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to workplace safety and loss prevention programs.
Title
Relates to workplace safety and loss prevention programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4369A |
2018-05-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2018-05-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2017-02-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A01458 (Same As) 2018-05-30 - print number 1458a