NY S04365 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.162
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to authorizing the superintendent of financial services to grant three credit hours of continuing education for a licensees' active membership in a statewide professional insurance producer association.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to authorizing the superintendent of financial services to grant three credit hours of continuing education for a licensees' active membership in a statewide professional insurance producer association.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-25AssemblyVETOED MEMO.162
2019-11-19SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.359
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a5922
2019-06-04Assemblyreferred to insurance
2019-06-04SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-15SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-14Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-13Senate1ST REPORT CAL.667
2019-03-11SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE

Same As/Similar To

A05922 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - substituted by s4365

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback