NY S04363 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-01-19 - PRINT NUMBER 4363A
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires employers of retail, food service or cleaning employees to give such employees 7 days' notice of their work schedule and a month's notice of the minimum hours of work; provides a private right of action to employees who are aggrieved by certain violations of such provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires employers of retail, food service or cleaning employees to give such employees 7 days' notice of their work schedule and a month's notice of the minimum hours of work; provides a private right of action to employees who are aggrieved by certain violations of such provisions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-19SenatePRINT NUMBER 4363A
2016-01-19SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR
2016-01-06SenateREFERRED TO LABOR
2015-03-17SenateREFERRED TO LABOR

Same As/Similar To

A09274 (Same As) 2016-02-10 - referred to labor

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback