NY S04357 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to selectively cutting timber and exclusion of current best management practices from regulated activities.
Title
Relates to selectively cutting timber and exclusion of current best management practices from regulated activities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-03-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-03-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.340 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2013-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07071 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation