NY S04345 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of the offense of coercion in the second degree to include the production or dissemination of intimate images; and relates to the definition of "sex offense".
Title
Expands the definition of the offense of coercion in the second degree to include the production or dissemination of intimate images; and relates to the definition of "sex offense".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2020-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-24 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4345A |
2020-01-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.61 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-05-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.585 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A04466 (Same As) 2020-02-20 - print number 4466a