NY S04342 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-25 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-25 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the trustees or board of education of any school district to employ retired former members of police or sheriff's departments as special security officers for such school district upon approval by the department of education; grants such officers peace officer status.
Title
Authorizes the trustees or board of education of any school district to employ retired former members of police or sheriff's departments as special security officers for such school district upon approval by the department of education; grants such officers peace officer status.
Sponsors
Sen. Carl Kruger [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | referred to codes | |
2010-06-25 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-25 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-14 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-06-10 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-06-09 | 1ST REPORT CAL.908 | |
2010-05-25 | PRINT NUMBER 4342A | |
2010-05-25 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2009-04-22 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A8196 (Same As) 2010-05-25 - amended on third reading 8196a