NY S04341 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes standards for crime victim awards for loss of earnings or support.
Title
Establishes standards for crime victim awards for loss of earnings or support.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2014-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1464 |
2014-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-02-27 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2013-05-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.737 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |