NY S04332 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the medical advisory committee to establish the use of comprehensive nationally recognized treatment guidelines for all body parts or conditions which have no recommendations by such advisory committee.
Title
Requires the medical advisory committee to establish the use of comprehensive nationally recognized treatment guidelines for all body parts or conditions which have no recommendations by such advisory committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.862 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4332B |
2015-06-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4332A |
2015-06-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2015-03-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A05530 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - ordered to third reading rules cal.518