NY S04332 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-16 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes provisions relating to retail farm operations; defines retail farm operations as a seasonal or annual enterprise operated for the purpose of selling predominantly farm and food products which are in support of agricultural production; includes retail farm operations under the definition of farm operations and the provisions of sound agricultural practices necessary for on-farm production, preparation and marketing.
Title
Makes provisions relating to retail farm operations; defines retail farm operations as a seasonal or annual enterprise operated for the purpose of selling predominantly farm and food products which are in support of agricultural production; includes retail farm operations under the definition of farm operations and the provisions of sound agricultural practices necessary for on-farm production, preparation and marketing.
Sponsors
Sen. Catharine Young [R] | Sen. Terry Gipson [D] | Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] |
Sen. David Valesky [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2014-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1381 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2013-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1278 |
2013-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A07063 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to agriculture