NY S04331 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-12 - signed chap.30
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-12 - signed chap.30
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces the limitations on the number of schools in the city of New York at which photo speed violation monitoring systems may be utilized and the times during which they may be operated; requires such city to install signs giving notice of the use of such a system; and extends the expiration of such program until July 1, 2022.
Title
Reduces the limitations on the number of schools in the city of New York at which photo speed violation monitoring systems may be utilized and the times during which they may be operated; requires such city to install signs giving notice of the use of such a system; and extends the expiration of such program until July 1, 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-12 | Senate | signed chap.30 |
2019-05-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.237 |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4331 |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-03-19 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-03-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-19 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-03-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.41 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | rules report cal.41 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | reported |
2019-03-18 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-03-18 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-14 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-03-07 | Senate | referred to transportation |
2019-03-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6449 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.237 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06449 (Same As) 2019-05-12 - signed chap.30