NY S04312 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - 2ND REPORT CAL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an exception for victims of child sexual abuse to the trust exemption from application to the satisfaction of a money judgment; allows victims of sexual abuse to enforce a money judgment against their abusers' trusts when the judgment was obtained as a result of such abuse; defines child sexual abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes an exception for victims of child sexual abuse to the trust exemption from application to the satisfaction of a money judgment; allows victims of sexual abuse to enforce a money judgment against their abusers' trusts when the judgment was obtained as a result of such abuse; defines child sexual abuse.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-04-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.435
2019-04-03SenatePRINT NUMBER 4312A
2019-04-03SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY
2019-03-07SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A02539 (Same As) 2019-04-09 - print number 2539a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback