NY S04308 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to criminal justice faculty employed by a community college.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to criminal justice faculty employed by a community college.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.280
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a7261a
2019-05-07Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2019-05-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-04-29SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 4308A
2019-03-25SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-03-20Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-03-19Senate1ST REPORT CAL.316
2019-03-07SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07261 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - substituted by s4308a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback