NY S04307 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the distribution of certain mandatory surcharges imposed for alcohol-related traffic convictions; establishes an impaired driving safety fund.
Title
Relates to the distribution of certain mandatory surcharges imposed for alcohol-related traffic convictions; establishes an impaired driving safety fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1830 |
2018-06-05 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-22 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-03-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4307A |
2018-03-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1466 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00909 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - print number 909a