NY S04302 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the authorization of debt in times of public emergency; limits the total amount of state debt; establishes a debt management board; relates to the refunding of state debts.
Title
Relates to the authorization of debt in times of public emergency; limits the total amount of state debt; establishes a debt management board; relates to the refunding of state debts.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-12 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-03-10 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-02-16 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2017-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |