NY S04300 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes boards of cooperative educational services to enter into certain contracts with out-of-state school districts related to existing technology products, including computer programs and software packages that help students learn and assist districts with achieving greater efficiencies; defines "out-of-state public school"; changes the term "common core" to "next generation" standards or curriculum.
Title
Authorizes boards of cooperative educational services to enter into certain contracts with out-of-state school districts related to existing technology products, including computer programs and software packages that help students learn and assist districts with achieving greater efficiencies; defines "out-of-state public school"; changes the term "common core" to "next generation" standards or curriculum.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2019-04-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4300C |
2019-04-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2019-04-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4300B |
2019-04-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2019-04-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4300A |
2019-04-15 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2019-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06336 (Same As) 2019-05-09 - enacting clause stricken