NY S04291 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-20 - SIGNED CHAP.551
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits comptroller from establishing an account in a banking institution with a "community reinvestment act of 1977" rating of less than satisfactory.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits comptroller from establishing an account in a banking institution with a "community reinvestment act of 1977" rating of less than satisfactory.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 119 N: 15 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-10-20 SIGNED CHAP.551
2010-10-08 DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2010-06-30 returned to senate
2010-06-30 passed assembly
2010-06-30 ordered to third reading rules cal.473
2010-06-30 substituted for a6312c
2010-06-28 referred to ways and means
2010-06-28 DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-06-28 PASSED SENATE
2010-06-24 AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4291C
2010-06-10 AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4291B
2010-05-24 AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4291A
2010-05-17 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2010-05-12 2ND REPORT CAL.
2010-05-11 1ST REPORT CAL.518
2010-05-03 NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
2010-01-06 REFERRED TO FINANCE
2009-04-21 REFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A6312 (Same As) 2010-06-30 - substituted by s4291c

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback