NY S04288 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-21 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-21 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates baseball as the official sport of the state of New York.
Title
Designates baseball as the official sport of the state of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-21 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2018-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1829 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07579 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to governmental operations