NY S04286 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the creation of the New York jockey injury compensation fund.
Title
Relates to the creation of the New York jockey injury compensation fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2017-02-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |