NY S04285 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-01 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Deems an application filed with the New York state and local police and fire retirement system by the widow of Lawrence Lakeman as timely filed.
Title
Deems an application filed with the New York state and local police and fire retirement system by the widow of Lawrence Lakeman as timely filed.
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Fred Akshar [R] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Robert Ortt [R] |
Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. Alexis Weik [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1803 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4285B |
2022-05-26 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-02-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4285A |
2022-02-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06619 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - enacting clause stricken
A09665 (Same As) 2022-05-27 - print number 9665a
A09665 (Same As) 2022-05-27 - print number 9665a