NY S04285 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.238
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.238
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Includes certain types of adult care facilities licensed under the social services law in the definition of originating site.
Title
Includes certain types of adult care facilities licensed under the social services law in the definition of originating site.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.238 |
2017-08-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.265 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a1464b |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4285A |
2017-06-05 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2017-06-05 | Senate | returned to senate |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-05-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-10 | Senate | returned to senate |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | referred to health |
2017-03-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-03-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-03-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.276 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A01464 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s4285a