NY S04284 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing the possession and sale of electronic dart guns and electronic stun guns for self-defense; adds such weapons in the definition of obstructing governmental administration by means of a self-defense spray device.
Title
Relates to allowing the possession and sale of electronic dart guns and electronic stun guns for self-defense; adds such weapons in the definition of obstructing governmental administration by means of a self-defense spray device.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1111 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2021-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A03236 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - referred to codes