NY S04282 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain voidable transfers affecting a federal home loan bank including injunctions and the conduct of delinquency proceedings against insurers domiciled in this state.
Title
Relates to certain voidable transfers affecting a federal home loan bank including injunctions and the conduct of delinquency proceedings against insurers domiciled in this state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-04-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.760 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2021-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A03573 (Same As) 2022-01-26 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE