NY S04281 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A585A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A585A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires providers of voice service to implement the STIR/SHAKEN authentication framework in the internet protocol networks of voice service providers.
Title
Requires providers of voice service to implement the STIR/SHAKEN authentication framework in the internet protocol networks of voice service providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A585A |
2021-05-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.849 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4281A |
2021-03-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2021-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00585 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - signed chap.585