NY S04280 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-19 - PRINT NUMBER 4280B
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-19 - PRINT NUMBER 4280B
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that ownership of an unidentifiable part in an otherwise identifiable motorcycle, other than a stolen motorcycle shall be returned to such owner, provided that department has made findings such owner had no knowledge part was unidentifiable and that owner wasn't responsible nor acted in concert to render such part unidentifiable; provides that a department investigation shall take place within thirty days after seizure of motorcycle; and requires commissioner to establish criteria to determine whether motorcycle shall be confiscated, seized or impounded and also to establish a system to ensure return of motorcycles to owners in undamaged condition.
Title
Provides that ownership of an unidentifiable part in an otherwise identifiable motorcycle, other than a stolen motorcycle shall be returned to such owner, provided that department has made findings such owner had no knowledge part was unidentifiable and that owner wasn't responsible nor acted in concert to render such part unidentifiable; provides that a department investigation shall take place within thirty days after seizure of motorcycle; and requires commissioner to establish criteria to determine whether motorcycle shall be confiscated, seized or impounded and also to establish a system to ensure return of motorcycles to owners in undamaged condition.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Libous [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Mark Grisanti [R] | Sen. Owen Johnson [R] |
Sen. Andrew Lanza [R] | Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] | Sen. James Seward [R] | Sen. Catharine Young [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4280B |
2012-04-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2011-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-05-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4280A |
2011-05-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2011-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06694 (Same As) 2012-04-25 - amended on third reading 6694b