NY S04269 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of health to appoint a work group to conduct a thorough review of the accessibility and fairness of the New York State Grant Gateway for individual applicants for funds under the physician loan repayment and physician practice support programs.
Title
Requires the commissioner of health to appoint a work group to conduct a thorough review of the accessibility and fairness of the New York State Grant Gateway for individual applicants for funds under the physician loan repayment and physician practice support programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.218 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.417 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | substituted for a5425 |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-05-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.759 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A05425 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.218