NY S04264 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A467A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A467A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reporting requirements for various classifications of gas leaks by utility corporations.
Title
Relates to reporting requirements for various classifications of gas leaks by utility corporations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Energy And Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A467A |
2018-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1756 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4264A |
2018-01-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1351 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00467 (Same As) 2018-12-07 - tabled