NY S04257 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Ensures that commercial tenants receive a lease; defines terms within leases; establishes requirements for commercial lease contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensures that commercial tenants receive a lease; defines terms within leases; establishes requirements for commercial lease contracts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2021-06-01SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 4257B
2021-05-11SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 4257A
2021-03-11SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-03-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-03-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.550
2021-02-03SenateREFERRED TO CITIES 1

Same As/Similar To

A07364 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - referred to judiciary

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback