NY S04257 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5576B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5576B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases certain special accidental death benefits paid to widows, widowers or the deceased member's children.
Title
Increases certain special accidental death benefits paid to widows, widowers or the deceased member's children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5576B |
2013-04-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-04-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.382 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4257B |
2013-04-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2013-03-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4257A |
2013-03-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2013-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A05576 (Same As) 2013-07-31 - signed chap.196