NY S04255 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - VETOED MEMO.164
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - VETOED MEMO.164
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes fund raising from consideration in appropriating state aid and reimbursement for services to volunteer ambulance companies, including regional emergency medical councils.
Title
Excludes fund raising from consideration in appropriating state aid and reimbursement for services to volunteer ambulance companies, including regional emergency medical councils.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-03 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.164 |
2012-09-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.150 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a5242 |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | referred to health |
2012-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.671 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | referred to health |
2011-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-06-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-06-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1104 |
2011-05-17 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2011-03-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A05242 (Same As) 2012-06-14 - substituted by s4255