NY S04254 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits insurers from refusing to issue or renew, cancel, or charge or impose an increased premium for homeowners' insurance policies based on the breed of a dog owned.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits insurers from refusing to issue or renew, cancel, or charge or impose an increased premium for homeowners' insurance policies based on the breed of a dog owned.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10Assemblyreturned to senate
2021-06-10Assemblypassed assembly
2021-06-10Assemblyordered to third reading cal.203
2021-06-10Assemblysubstituted for a4075
2021-06-08Assemblyreferred to codes
2021-06-08SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-06-07SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1537
2021-06-07SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2021-02-03SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE

Same As/Similar To

A04075 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - substituted by s4254

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback