NY S04251 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - PRINT NUMBER 4251A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - PRINT NUMBER 4251A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Robin Garfinkle, the widow of Howard Mahler, to file a retirement option election form on behalf of her deceased husband.
Title
Authorizes Robin Garfinkle, the widow of Howard Mahler, to file a retirement option election form on behalf of her deceased husband.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4251A |
2020-02-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07059 (Same As) 2020-07-10 - print number 7059a