NY S04248 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.509
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to requiring the court to consider the best interest of a companion animal when awarding possession in a divorce or separation proceeding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to requiring the court to consider the best interest of a companion animal when awarding possession in a divorce or separation proceeding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-25SenateSIGNED CHAP.509
2021-10-13SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2021-05-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2021-05-20Assemblypassed assembly
2021-05-10Assemblyordered to third reading cal.322
2021-05-10Assemblysubstituted for a5775
2021-05-05Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2021-05-05SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-05-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-03-25SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2021-03-24Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2021-03-23Senate1ST REPORT CAL.622
2021-03-23Senate1ST REPORT CAL.622
2021-02-03SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A05775 (Same As) 2021-05-10 - substituted by s4248

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback