NY S04246 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-23 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to guaranteed shares of revenue of the metropolitan commuter transportation mobility tax; provides that monies in the mobility tax trust account shall be paid over directly to the chief financial officer of each respective county of the district to defray certain transportation, maintenance, and operation costs.
Title
Relates to guaranteed shares of revenue of the metropolitan commuter transportation mobility tax; provides that monies in the mobility tax trust account shall be paid over directly to the chief financial officer of each respective county of the district to defray certain transportation, maintenance, and operation costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-05-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-02-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06561 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means