NY S04237 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - APPROVAL MEMO.33
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - APPROVAL MEMO.33
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prevents institutions from implementing contingencies on the receipt of state funding by preventing the use of language in agreements regarding mandatory arbitration, internal dispute processes, prohibiting class actions and prohibiting the disclosure of any information in the agreement to anyone.
Title
Prevents institutions from implementing contingencies on the receipt of state funding by preventing the use of language in agreements regarding mandatory arbitration, internal dispute processes, prohibiting class actions and prohibiting the disclosure of any information in the agreement to anyone.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.33 |
2021-11-03 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.573 |
2021-10-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.301 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a3136a |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1133 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4237A |
2021-05-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2021-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03136 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - substituted by s4237a