NY S04229 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
Pending: Senate Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to access to reports of child abuse and maltreatment by criminal justice agencies; requires the office of children and family services to establish a centralized database of reports of child abuse and maltreatment for criminal justice agencies to access in the performance of their duties; defines criminal justice agencies.
Title
Relates to access to reports of child abuse and maltreatment by criminal justice agencies; requires the office of children and family services to establish a centralized database of reports of child abuse and maltreatment for criminal justice agencies to access in the performance of their duties; defines criminal justice agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2019-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1308 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4229A |
2019-05-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2019-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A02562 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to children and families