NY S04217 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-09 - PRINT NUMBER 4217A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-09 - PRINT NUMBER 4217A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the real property tax exemption for veterans organizations to include property so owned which is occupied by any person although not also entitled to exemption.
Title
Extends the real property tax exemption for veterans organizations to include property so owned which is occupied by any person although not also entitled to exemption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4217A |
2012-01-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A01277 (Same As) 2012-01-19 - print number 1277a